California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013