LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB218
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB218
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB218
Compare Versions
AB218 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB218 Enrolled September 19, 2013
AB218 Amended May 24, 2013
AB218 Amended April 10, 2013
AB218 Introduced February 4, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB218 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB218 Enrolled September 19, 2013
AB218 Amended May 24, 2013
AB218 Amended April 10, 2013
AB218 Introduced February 4, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare