|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 733, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6475.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4837.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|