California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014