|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 812, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6463.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4761.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5183.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|