California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2217 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2217CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 812 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 22, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Melendez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Buchanan, Hagman, Maienschein, and Waldron) FEBRUARY 20, 2014 An act to add Section 49417 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2217, Melendez. Pupil and personnel health: automated external defibrillators. Existing law authorizes a school district or school to provide a comprehensive program in first aid or cardiopulmonary resuscitation training, or both, to pupils and employees, and requires the program to be developed using specified guidelines. This bill would authorize a public school to solicit and receive nonstate funds to acquire and maintain an automated external defibrillator (AED). The bill would provide that the employees of the school district are not liable for civil damages resulting from certain uses, attempted uses, or nonuses of an AED, except as provided. The bill would provide that a public school or school district that complies with certain requirements related to an AED is not liable for any civil damages resulting from any act or omission in the rendering of the emergency care or treatment, except as provided. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 49417 is added to the Education Code, to read: 49417. (a) A public school may solicit and receive nonstate funds to acquire and maintain an automated external defibrillator (AED). These funds shall only be used to acquire and maintain an AED and to provide training to school employees regarding use of an AED. (b) Except as provided in subdivision (d), if an employee of a school district complies with Section 1714.21 of the Civil Code in rendering emergency care or treatment through the use, attempted use, or nonuse of an AED at the scene of an emergency, the employee shall not be liable for any civil damages resulting from any act or omission in the rendering of the emergency care or treatment. (c) Except as provided in subdivision (d), if a public school or school district complies with the requirements of Section 1797.196 of the Health and Safety Code, the public school or school district shall be covered by Section 1714.21 of the Civil Code and shall not be liable for any civil damages resulting from any act or omission in the rendering of the emergency care or treatment. (d) Subdivisions (b) and (c) do not apply in the case of personal injury or wrongful death that results from gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct on the part of the person who uses, attempts to use, or maliciously fails to use an AED to render emergency care or treatment. (e) This section does not alter the requirements of Section 1797.196 of the Health and Safety Code.