|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 6663.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4899.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 4702.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Galgiani. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4735.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 5341.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|