California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014