Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4919.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4881.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4950.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|