LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2293
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2293
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2293
Compare Versions
AB2293 Chaptered September 17, 2014
AB2293 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 26, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 20, 2014
AB2293 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2293 Amended June 19, 2014
AB2293 Amended May 15, 2014
AB2293 Amended April 10, 2014
AB2293 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2293 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2293 Chaptered September 17, 2014
AB2293 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 26, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2293 Amended August 20, 2014
AB2293 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2293 Amended June 19, 2014
AB2293 Amended May 15, 2014
AB2293 Amended April 10, 2014
AB2293 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2293 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare