Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 4958.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|