California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2297 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 08/04/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2297AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 4, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 1250.07 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2297, as amended, Levine. Health facilities: reliable alternative clean energy technologies. Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of health facilities by the State Department of Public Health. A violation of these provisions is a crime. Existing law requires certain health facilities to test diesel backup generators in accordance with specified provisions. This bill would authorize  these  health facilities  , as defined,  to use reliable alternative clean energy technologies as primary or backup power sources if the technology meets reliability requirements set forth by federal and state regulators. The bill would require the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development to submit to the California Building Standards Commission building standards for the use of reliable alternative clean energy technologies for essential power systems, to be adopted in the  next triennial edition of the  California Building Standards Code. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1250.07 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 1250.07. (a) A health facility, as defined in  subdivision (e) of  Section  41514.1,   1250,  may use reliable alternative clean energy technologies as primary or backup power sources if the technology meets reliability requirements set forth by federal and state regulators. (b) The Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development shall submit to the California Building Standards Commission building standards for the use of reliable alternative clean energy technologies for essential power systems to be adopted in the  next triennial edition of the  California Building Standards Code, if the alternative clean energy technologies meet federal requirements.