|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 609, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6289.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4658.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|