California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill June 11, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014