California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014