LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2374
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2374
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2374
Compare Versions
AB2374 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB2374 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2374 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2374 Amended August 19, 2014
AB2374 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2374 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2374 Amended April 8, 2014
AB2374 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2374 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB2374 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2374 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2374 Amended August 19, 2014
AB2374 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2374 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2374 Amended April 8, 2014
AB2374 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare