|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 6445.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4711.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 5095.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4952.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|