California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill May 15, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014