|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6522.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4838.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5365.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|