California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014