|
07/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4254.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|