California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2439 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/21/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2439CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 168 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 21, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 21, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 3, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Donnelly FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 12172.3 of the Government Code, relating to initiatives. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2439, Donnelly. Secretary of State: initiative information. The California Constitution reserves the right of the people to propose statutes and amendments to the Constitution by initiative measure. Existing law authorizes the Legislative Counsel to cooperate with proponents in drafting an initiative measure, as specified. Existing law requires the Secretary of State to perform a specified review of a proposed initiative measure prior to circulation of the measure, upon the request of the measure's proponents. Existing law also requires the Secretary to prepare, and make available, a pamphlet describing the procedures and requirements relating to the initiative process. This bill would require the Secretary to post on the Secretary's Internet Web site, and to include in a specified pamphlet prepared by the Secretary relating to the initiative process, information describing these services provided by the Secretary and the Legislative Counsel to the proponents of an initiative measure. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12172.3 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12172.3. The Secretary of State shall post on the Secretary's Internet Web site and include in the pamphlet developed pursuant to Section 9018 of the Elections Code, information describing the following services that are available to the proponents of a proposed initiative measure. (a) The Legislative Counsel's cooperation in preparing an initiative measure pursuant to Section 10243. (b) The Secretary's review of prepared initiatives prior to circulation pursuant to Section 12172.