|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2902.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2099.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1664.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|