California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 8, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013