|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 8. Page 6104.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4467.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 5226.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|