California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2453 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014