|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 6588.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4849.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 4711.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|