California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2455 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill June 17, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 10, 2014