|
07/08/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4141.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4852.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|