California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2014

Amended

Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014