California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill July 3, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014