LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2499
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2499
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2499
Compare Versions
AB2499 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB2499 Enrolled August 20, 2014
AB2499 Amended July 3, 2014
AB2499 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2499 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2499 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2499 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB2499 Enrolled August 20, 2014
AB2499 Amended July 3, 2014
AB2499 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2499 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2499 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare