|
09/27/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 6589.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4858.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 4753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|