California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014