Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |