California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Amended

Bill May 15, 2014
Bill May 12, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014