Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5203.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|