California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2584 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/16/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2584AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Bradford   )  FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 2827.8 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2584, as amended, Nestande.  Energy: California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.   Electricity: wind energy co-metering.  Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations, as defined, while local publicly owned electric utilities, as defined, are under the direction of their governing board. Existing law relative to private energy producers requires every electric utility, as defined, to develop a standard contract or tariff providing for net energy metering, as defined, and to make this contract or tariff available to eligible customer generators, as defined, upon request for generation by a renewable electrical generation facility, as defined. Existing law authorizes a local publicly owned electric utility to elect to instead offer co-energy metering, which uses a generation-to-generation energy and time-of-use credit formula, as specified. Existing law establishes separate requirements for wind energy co-metering that provides a credit against the generation component of an electricity bill of an electric utility for those eligible customer-generators utilizing a wind energy project with a generating capacity greater than 50 kilowatts, but not exceeding one megawatt, unless approved by the electric utility. This bill would provide that, for  a United States Department of Defense installation that operates a wind turbine and is served by Southern California Edison,   the United States Marine Corp Logistics Base, Barstow,  wind energy co-metering is available if the generating capacity does not exceed 1.5 megawatts. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2827.8 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 2827.8. Notwithstanding any other provisions of this article, the following provisions apply to an eligible customer-generator utilizing wind energy co-metering with a capacity of more than 50 kilowatts, but not exceeding one megawatt, or for  a United States Department of Defense installation that operates a wind turbine and is served by Southern California Edison,   the United States Marine Corp Logistics Base, Barstow,  not exceeding 1.5 megawatts, unless approved by the electric utility. (a) The eligible customer-generator shall be required to utilize a meter, or multiple meters, capable of separately measuring electricity flow in both directions. Nothing in this section precludes the use of advanced metering infrastructure devices. All meters shall provide "time-of-use" measurements of electricity flow, and the customer shall take service on a time-of-use rate schedule. If the existing meter of the eligible customer-generator is not a time-of-use meter or is not capable of measuring total flow of energy in both directions, the eligible customer-generator is responsible for all expenses involved in purchasing and installing a meter that is both time-of-use and able to measure total electricity flow in both directions. This subdivision shall not restrict the ability of an eligible customer-generator to utilize any economic incentives provided by a government agency or the electric utility to reduce its costs for purchasing and installing a time-of-use meter. (b) The consumption of electricity from the electric utility for wind energy co-metering by an eligible customer-generator shall be priced in accordance with the standard rate charged to the eligible customer-generator in accordance with the rate structure to which the customer would be assigned if the customer did not use an eligible wind electrical generating facility. The generation of electricity provided to the electric utility shall result in a credit to the eligible customer-generator and shall be priced in accordance with the generation component, excluding surcharges to cover the purchase of power by the Department of Water Resources, established under the applicable structure to which the customer would be assigned if the customer did not use an eligible wind electrical generating facility.