|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5955.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4375.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4842.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|