California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014