|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4649.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5357.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|