California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 28, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014