|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 426, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6181.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6190.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4560.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5102.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|