LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2667
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2667
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2667
Compare Versions
AB2667 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB2667 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB2667 Amended August 13, 2014
AB2667 Amended June 15, 2014
AB2667 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2667 Amended March 27, 2014
AB2667 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2667 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB2667 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB2667 Amended August 13, 2014
AB2667 Amended June 15, 2014
AB2667 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2667 Amended March 27, 2014
AB2667 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare