|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 508, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6479.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4808.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5165.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|