California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2685 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 12, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014