|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6380.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4499.).
|
|
|
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2014
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2014
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3929.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4973.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|