California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 7, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014