California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014