LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2752
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2752
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2752
Compare Versions
AB2752 Chaptered September 15, 2014
AB2752 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2752 Amended August 14, 2014
AB2752 Amended June 19, 2014
AB2752 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2752 Introduced March 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2752 Chaptered September 15, 2014
AB2752 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2752 Amended August 14, 2014
AB2752 Amended June 19, 2014
AB2752 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2752 Introduced March 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare